Financial history JOHN SAMUEL NEWLYN

Charity number: 208780
Charity reporting is overdue by 162 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/03/2018 15/03/2019 15/03/2020 15/03/2021 15/03/2022
Total gross income £4.78k £5.10k £5.27k £4.14k £4.72k
Total expenditure £4.98k £4.70k £4.75k £17.62k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A