Financial history THE HACKNEY HORSE SOCIETY

Charity number: 208905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £88.72k £71.32k £79.51k £42.57k £53.86k
Total expenditure £83.07k £74.26k £84.36k £69.53k £58.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A