Accounts and annual returns THE STRANGERS REST MISSION

Charity number: 209117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 28 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 07 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late Download Open in new window