THE BRITISH COUNCIL

Charity number: 209131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £979.64m £1.08bn £1.17bn £1.25bn £1.29bn
Total expenditure £986.94m £1.09bn £1.17bn £1.22bn £1.30bn
Income from government contracts £75.34m £87.54m £55.32m £40.85m £42.05m
Income from government grants £162.75m £159.38m £169.28m £223.84m £236.69m
Income - Donations and legacies £161.65m £158.30m £168.28m £184.23m £186.70m
Income - Other trading activities £1.75m £1.48m £906.53k £872.67k £578.42k
Income - Charitable activities £805.35m £896.23m £994.58m £1.06bn £1.09bn
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.28m £3.30m £2.84m £2.71m £3.38m
Income - Other £8.60m £17.58m £5.73m £3.78m £9.05m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £981.76m £1.08bn £1.16bn £1.20bn £1.28bn
Expenditure - Raising funds £560.04k £713.92k £21.22k £204.29k £44.94k
Expenditure - Governance £5.60m £6.23m £9.08m £17.89m £11.80m
Expenditure - Grants institution £144.69m £122.53m £166.83m £19.61m £228.03m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £4.62m £9.56m £10.16m £15.68m £13.70m