THE LODDON TOWN ESTATE

Charity number: 209135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Owen Chair 05 November 2014 None on record
BRIAN COX Trustee 06 December 2011 None on record
June Strickland Trustee 05 November 2014 None on record
Tricia Gunson Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record
VALERIE COUNTER Trustee 13 March 2013 None on record
Margaret Wallace Trustee 28 September 2011 None on record