SWEDENBORG SOCIETY

Charity number: 209172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £440.10k £660.10k £515.78k £487.78k £504.66k
Total expenditure £467.95k £459.02k £463.20k £555.35k £408.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.86k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £220.31k £77.24k N/A £63.77k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £45.93k £41.17k N/A £27.39k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £12.81k N/A £7.81k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £393.86k £384.55k N/A £384.83k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £20.86k
Income - Legacies N/A £115.09k £65.53k N/A £54.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £375.28k £392.76k N/A £344.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £72.54k £70.44k N/A £63.72k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £43.76k N/A £22.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £37.26k £30.33k N/A £26.82k
Expenditure - Other N/A £11.21k £0 N/A £0