Trustees SWEDENBORG SOCIETY
Charity number: 209172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Morley | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Sutton | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Michael Cowley | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Lewin | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Erika Heilman | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Cumberlidge | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kristin King | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Erica Adele Wyncoll | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rufus De Appleby Moore | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bentley | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.