DR RADCLIFFE'S TRUST

Charity number: 209212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £499.98k £691.73k £602.20k £664.93k £649.00k
Total expenditure £533.75k £604.57k £660.97k £581.47k £580.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £691.73k £602.20k £664.93k £649.00k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £507.70k £570.28k £496.30k £503.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £96.87k £90.69k £85.17k £76.82k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £51.43k £42.41k £81.53k £79.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £399.08k £488.20k £414.77k £423.92k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £54.88k £52.35k £85.17k £76.82k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0