ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT ISLE OF THANET BRANCH

Charity number: 209365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 16 September 2016 On time Download