ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT ISLE OF THANET BRANCH

Charity number: 209365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £223.97k £307.81k £317.78k £365.85k £378.91k
Total expenditure £241.76k £300.75k £322.20k £364.17k £420.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £4.97k N/A