Governing document The Institute of Physics Benevolent Fund

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14/03/1933 AND RULES ADOPTED 05/12/1961 AS AMENDED 27/10/1994 AS AMENDED 19/07/2012 as amended on 26 Apr 2018 as amended on 26 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE PRIMARY AIM OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROVIDE ELIGIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND SUCH OTHER PERSONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME WHO ARE FACING SERIOUS FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER CRITICAL NEED WITH ASSISTANCE DESIGNED TO ALLEVIATE THE CAUSES OF THEIR ADVERSITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.