Financial history THE JOSEPH ROWNTREE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 210037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £583.98k £331.00k £292.00k £1.62m £1.88m
Total expenditure £12.67m £11.12m £15.71m £19.96m £15.68m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £845 N/A N/A £120 £700.63k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £582.64k N/A N/A £1.62m £1.17m
Income - Other £496 N/A N/A £190 £169
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.93m N/A N/A £16.17m £12.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.47m N/A N/A £3.78m £3.36m
Expenditure - Governance £71.52k N/A N/A £109.41k £123.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £7.05m N/A N/A £14.85m £10.61m
Expenditure - Investment management £3.47m N/A N/A £3.78m £3.36m
Expenditure - Other £1.26m N/A N/A £0 £0