THE ROYAL STAR & GARTER HOMES

Charity number: 210119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.87m £18.10m £17.32m £18.03m £19.23m
Total expenditure £13.16m £14.18m £16.18m £20.48m £23.54m
Income from government contracts £2.22m £2.20m £1.93m £1.90m £2.27m
Income from government grants £0 £377.00k £207.95k £108.45k £449.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £8.27m £8.46m £6.92m £6.46m £6.29m
Income - Other trading activities £136.00k £144.00k £132.00k £109.00k £81.00k
Income - Charitable activities £5.84m £7.04m £7.54m £8.66m £9.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.63m £2.44m £2.71m £2.79m £2.42m
Income - Other £1.00k £2.00k £12.00k £10.00k £457.00k
Income - Legacies £6.31m £6.54m £5.28m £5.13m £4.36m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.13m £12.41m £14.11m £18.98m £22.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.01m £1.76m £2.07m £1.50m £1.53m
Expenditure - Governance £86.00k £84.00k £98.00k £108.00k £117.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £267.00k £363.00k £609.00k £340.00k £401.00k
Expenditure - Other £12.00k £0 £0 £0 £0