CHELTENHAM AND NORTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 210222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 March 2018 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required