CHELTENHAM AND NORTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 210222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.33k £2.72k £5.87k £3.31k £2.51k
Total expenditure £4.37k £3.00k £3.58k £3.85k £7.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A