Financial history THE INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERS

Charity number: 210252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £34.29m £35.71m £37.20m £33.07m £35.04m
Total expenditure £32.88m £36.30m £35.58m £30.68m £29.80m
Income from government contracts £1.59m £393.50k £546.43k £1.25m £1.08m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £502.55k £220.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.65m £981.00k £787.00k £1.43m £974.00k
Income - Other trading activities £16.32m £17.31m £18.46m £13.23m £15.55m
Income - Charitable activities £15.93m £16.91m £17.42m £17.89m £18.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £381.00k £391.00k £401.00k £253.00k £240.00k
Income - Other £11.00k £111.00k £137.00k £264.00k £117.00k
Income - Legacies £562.50k £123.00k £38.00k £43.00k £66.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.89m £22.74m £21.63m £19.67m £18.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.99m £13.56m £13.95m £11.01m £11.08m
Expenditure - Governance £183.00k £309.00k £248.00k £140.00k £41.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £115.00k £58.00k £110.00k £69.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £105.00k £141.00k £134.00k £110.00k £116.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0