Accounts and annual returns Kempton House Day Centre

Charity number: 210648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required