Financial history Kempton House Day Centre

Charity number: 210648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £19.16k £19.10k £40.64k £65.56k £57.78k
Total expenditure £19.17k £23.09k £33.78k £31.85k £47.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.00k N/A