CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT BRANCH OF THE RSPCA

Charity number: 210743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £567.19k £506.97k £526.76k £509.84k £562.57k
Total expenditure £538.88k £561.37k £553.15k £552.71k £477.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £101.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £148.29k £130.09k £147.22k £141.04k £383.91k
Income - Other trading activities £397.43k £357.48k £361.07k £345.29k £136.24k
Income - Charitable activities £21.04k £19.06k £18.37k £23.33k £42.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £428 £343 £97 £183 £22
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £98.00k £13.36k £31.52k £16.93k £11.62k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £210.10k £258.57k £275.13k £255.46k £205.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds £302.86k £276.33k £278.02k £278.57k £272.37k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £25.87k £26.47k £0 £18.69k £0