PEMBROKE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE MISSION

Charity number: 211025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £326.37k £409.58k £420.10k £559.33k £0
Total expenditure £356.91k £404.56k £436.75k £533.93k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £15.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.96k £27.46k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £275.01k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £69.97k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £156.19k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £58.16k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £450.67k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £83.25k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A