Financial history THE ROGER AND SARAH BANCROFT CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 211513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.92m £345.41k £162.75k £66.68k £80.11k
Total expenditure £350.18k £466.05k £400.24k £182.70k £4.34m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.77m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £158.14k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £363 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £10.77m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £339.18k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £29.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £309.94k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £11.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A