WALSALL CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 211551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £9.24k £9.10k £11.89k £7.90k £16
Total expenditure £11.23k £11.46k £8.43k £6.89k £106
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A