Financial history JOHN MENZIES (SOUTHERN) LIMITED EMPLOYEES' BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 211621
Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.95k £13.52k £14.32k £16.23k £14.33k
Total expenditure £11.90k £10.32k £7.03k £6.99k £33.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A