Financial history FRIENDS WORLD COMMITTEE FOR CONSULTATION

Charity number: 211647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £325.47k £346.77k £260.54k £269.17k £186.60k
Total expenditure £225.38k £257.32k £231.16k £233.22k £220.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £7.19k N/A