ST BARTHOLOMEW'S GATEHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 211859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Bovill Trustee 15 April 2021 None on record
Major General Jeffrey Sinclair Mason MBE Trustee 01 October 2020
THE NATIONAL MUSEUM OF THE ROYAL NAVY Received: On time
Roy Keith Sully Trustee 31 May 2019
THE ST BARTHOLOMEW THE GREAT HERITAGE TRUST Received: On time
Michael Charles Jones Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
Iain David Bailey Trustee 26 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT ST BARTHOLOMEW Received: On time
THE ST BARTHOLOMEW THE GREAT HERITAGE TRUST Received: On time
The Reverend Mark Alexander Walker Trustee 11 February 2017
THE ST BARTHOLOMEW THE GREAT HERITAGE TRUST Received: On time