THE ABBEYFIELD (ST ALBANS) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 211934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.54m £1.54m £1.66m £1.73m £1.56m
Total expenditure £1.49m £1.55m £1.58m £1.66m £1.67m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £72.53k
Income - Donations and legacies £101.25k £5.17k £18.19k £14.15k £1.83k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.51m £1.61m £1.67m £1.42m
Income - Endowments £101.25k £5.17k £0 £14.15k £0
Income - Investment £16.45k £25.51k £32.42k £36.02k £33.58k
Income - Other £4.00k £4.18k £3.50k £6.40k £109.36k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £15.34k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.49m £1.55m £1.58m £1.66m £1.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £21.33k £23.37k £23.70k £24.22k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0