THE ABBEYFIELD (ST ALBANS) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 211934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 01 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 15 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 14 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 13 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 13 March 2017 On time Download