CHELTENHAM SENIOR CITIZENS' WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 212051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 02 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 05 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required