CHELTENHAM SENIOR CITIZENS' WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 212051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £7.08k £6.79k £12.57k £7.13k £8.90k
Total expenditure £13.22k £13.21k £12.37k £10.97k £9.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A