HINDOLVESTON TRUST

Charity number: 212159
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.82k £8.95k £1.83k £1.97k £1.80k
Total expenditure £227 £1.80k £1.19k £8.00k £227
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A