Financial history POOR'S ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 212413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2017 27/02/2018 27/02/2019 27/02/2020 27/02/2021
Total gross income £21 £21 £18 £361 £23
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £147 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A