ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LONDON SOUTH EAST BRANCH

Charity number: 212444
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £220.67k £217.00k £193.56k £225.19k £226.70k
Total expenditure £207.31k £227.00k £178.28k £224.48k £214.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0