FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 212682
Charity reporting is overdue by 938 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £3.24k £2.93k £2.61k £2.64k £2.75k
Total expenditure £2.14k £3.53k £2.27k £2.81k £2.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A