Financial history HACKNEY BENEVOLENT PENSION SOCIETY

Charity number: 212731
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £2.22k £2.58k £2.63k £2.15k £2.44k
Total expenditure £4.61k £4.47k £3.71k £2.17k £1.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A