ANGLO-BRAZILIAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 212861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.25k £6.72k £14.06k £2.58k £1.24k
Total expenditure £9.80k £9.03k £11.65k £1.80k £920
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A