Accounts and annual returns THE AIR PILOTS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 212952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 14 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 24 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window