Financial history THE AIR PILOTS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 212952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £50.32k £28.56k £37.92k £34.22k £27.97k
Total expenditure £57.74k £27.83k £20.55k £24.73k £35.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A