THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 212992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £2.70m £2.86m £2.82m £3.49m £3.20m
Total expenditure £3.94m £3.95m £3.81m £3.73m £3.34m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.00k £71.34k £2.03k £2.26k £21.57k
Income - Other trading activities £69.55k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.18m £2.38m £2.48m £2.95m £2.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £2.29k £0 £0 £21.57k
Income - Investment £375.46k £374.81k £317.71k £466.03k £491.55k
Income - Other £68.86k £29.54k £24.28k £67.00k £2.74k
Income - Legacies £0 £69.05k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.61m £3.94m £3.77m £3.73m £3.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A -£18.05k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £214.83k £179.09k £178.49k £93.35k £132.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management -£21.29k -£18.05k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £51.56k £26.92k £45.82k £0 £0