Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL CALEDONIAN CHARITIES TRUST

Charity number: 213074
Charity reporting is overdue by 212 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 212 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 212 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 19 October 2022 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 19 October 2022 81 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 17 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 October 2020 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 16 February 2021 201 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window