Financial history THE ROYAL CALEDONIAN CHARITIES TRUST

Charity number: 213074
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £154.88k £138.80k £133.91k £27.86k £38.32k
Total expenditure £152.09k £133.18k £139.72k £31.62k £14.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A