Financial history THE QUEEN VICTORIA CLERGY FUND

Charity number: 213258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £135.53k £138.54k £141.81k £145.61k £139.97k
Total expenditure £161.42k £162.87k £160.44k £160.29k £159.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A