WALTHAM ABBEY NON-EDUCATIONAL PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 213327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 December 2019 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 December 2019 53 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 18 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 13 October 2016 On time Download