WALTHAM ABBEY NON-EDUCATIONAL PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 213327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £95.38k £96.73k £103.02k £100.81k £99.33k
Total expenditure £79.74k £82.60k £110.45k £99.61k £91.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A