ST PETER'S COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 214164
Charity reporting is up to date (198 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £54.39k £54.95k £54.95k £51.12k £50.55k
Total expenditure £54.46k £59.87k £59.87k £60.43k £49.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A