EDWARD HUNSTONE

Charity number: 214570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 November 2019 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time Download