EDWARD HUNSTONE

Charity number: 214570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.47k £29.81k £29.92k £30.00k £30.01k
Total expenditure £22.83k £16.52k £26.19k £22.72k £20.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A