JOHN SUGARS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 214681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 April 2021 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 May 2021 190 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 January 2020 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 January 2020 88 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 January 2019 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 February 2019 97 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 January 2018 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 December 2020 1142 days late Download