JOHN SUGARS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 214681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.87k £25.46k £26.00k £29.00k £29.60k
Total expenditure £16.49k £21.46k £31.00k £32.00k £24.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A