C F LUNOE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 214850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 09 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 09 May 2017 On time Download