THE WALSINGHAM COLLEGE TRUST ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 215863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.69m £2.87m £3.23m £2.98m £5.79m
Total expenditure £2.70m £2.77m £2.86m £2.66m £6.48m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £604.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £340.07k £464.33k £788.33k £470.19k £423.47k
Income - Other trading activities £1.19m £1.20m £1.20m £1.22m £462.94k
Income - Charitable activities £929.65k £960.22k £988.81k £1.02m £3.84m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £229.51k £242.92k £250.17k £269.04k £464.83k
Income - Other £1 £1 £0 £0 £604.87k
Income - Legacies £88.07k £158.51k £466.02k £193.73k £46.14k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.65m £1.71m £1.78m £1.55m £5.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.05m £1.06m £1.08m £1.11m £491.71k
Expenditure - Governance £299.74k £333.96k £360.89k £486.06k £515.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £26.65k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0